judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-01001-CR
05-89-01001-CR
08/28/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Allen, Cecil Lloyd
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/08/1994Letter issued by the court
06/08/1994Order entered
06/06/1994Motion to withdraw record filed
12/11/1990Mandate Issued
12/11/1990Mandate Issued
10/10/1990Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
10/10/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/10/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/19/1990Submitted
09/19/1990Submission
09/19/1990Submission
09/19/1990Submitted
06/29/1990MattConv
02/22/1990Brief Filed
02/22/1990Case ready to be set
02/22/1990Case ready to be set
01/23/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/22/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/28/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/22/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/27/1989Brief Filed
11/07/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/06/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/03/1989Motion for extension of time to file record filed
10/05/1989Transcript Filed
09/08/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/31/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/28/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/09/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
08/09/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/11/1990Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 5
Dallas
F88-91403-IL
45 yrs TDC