judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1195-89
PD-1195-89
08/28/1989
PDR Case Type
WILEY, WILLARD TYRONE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/10/1989FINAL DISPRefused
10/25/1989PDR DISPRefused
09/28/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
08/28/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/20/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn C. Vance
Wiley, Willard TyroneApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)John H. Hagler
Court of Appeals Information:
08-89-00126-CR
Aff 7-12-89
8th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
282nd District Court
Dallas
Honorable TOM PRICE
F88-77643-S