judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1198-89
PD-1198-89
08/28/1989
PDR Case Type
ROBINSON, JOHN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/20/1989FINAL DISP/REHEARRefused
12/20/1989REHEAR DISPDENIED
11/22/1989REHEAR FILED
11/08/1989PDR DISPRefused
09/28/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
08/28/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/22/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
ROBINSON, JOHNApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Jon Muschenheim
STATE OF TEXASStateThomas L. Bridges
Court of Appeals Information:
13-88-00510-CR
Aff 5-25-89
13th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
36th District Court
San Patricio
Honorable Clarence N. Stevenson
7173-1