judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BERTHEL LAND AND LIVESTOCK, a Wyoming Limited Partnership v. ROCKIES EXPRESS PIPELINE, LLC fka ENTREGA GAS PIPELINE, LLC and KINDER MORGAN NATGAS OPERATOR, LLC, both organized under the law of Delaware

Case Heading (S-10-0227)
Case Number:S-10-0227Case Docketed On:10/25/2010
Linked To: S-10-0228
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:BERTHEL LAND AND LIVESTOCK, a Wyoming Limited Partnership v. ROCKIES EXPRESS PIPELINE, LLC fka ENTREGA GAS PIPELINE, LLC and KINDER MORGAN NATGAS OPERATOR, LLC, both organized under the law of Delaware
Full Title:BERTHEL LAND AND LIVESTOCK, a Wyoming Limited Partnership, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. ROCKIES EXPRESS PIPELINE, LLC fka ENTREGA GAS PIPELINE, LLC and KINDER MORGAN NATGAS OPERATOR, LLC, both organized under the law of Delaware, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBerthel Land and Livestock, a Wyoming limited partnershipWilliam G. Hibbler
AppelleeRockies Express Pipeline, LLCDavid G. Ditto
AppelleeKinder Morgan Natgas Operator, LLCDavid G. Ditto

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Property -Servitudes, Trial - Damages
Opinion Number:2012 WY 52
Citation:275 P.3d 423

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/25/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/25/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/25/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/25/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/06/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/07/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/24/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/24/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/22/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/24/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Bill Hibbler for Berthel Land and Livestock.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David G. Ditto for Rockies Express Pipeline, LLC.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/08/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/15/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (William G. Hibbler for Berthel Land and Livestock; David G. Ditto for appellees Rockies Express Pipeline, LLC, et al.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/15/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/17/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, eight volumes. Volumes I-VI, Original Papers; Volume VII, Transcripts; Volume III, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/17/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/10/2012Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/26/2012Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/26/2012Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/26/2012Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/26/2012Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/01/2012Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for on 4/30/2012.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal