judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1184-89
PD-1184-89
08/28/1989
PDR Case Type
WEISINGER, MIKE ROBERT
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/08/1989RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/17/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/01/1989PDR DISPRefused
09/08/1989RESPONSE FILED
08/28/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/28/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Weisinger, Mike RobertApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Charles Rice Young
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn Holmes
Court of Appeals Information:
14-88-01030-CR
Aff 7-20-89
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
176th District Court
Harris
Honorable BRIAN RAINS
492764