judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1186-89
PD-1186-89
08/28/1989
PDR Case Type
HILL, GENE WESLEY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/17/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/01/1989PDR DISPRefused
09/28/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
08/28/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/28/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateJoe L. Price
HILL, GENE WESLEYApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Tom Brown
Court of Appeals Information:
09-88-00257-CR
Aff 6-28-89
9th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
258th District Court
Polk
Honorable JOE NED DEAN
11,950