judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals

Case: 06-89-09800-CV
06-89-09800-CV
08/28/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Tate, Connie, Et Al
Sartain, Jr., Henry, Et Al
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/25/2000Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/18/1991Mandate Issued
11/20/1990Case Returned from Higher Ct.
10/17/1990Writ Disposed
08/17/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
08/02/1990Writ Filed
07/03/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/20/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/05/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/27/1990Post-submission brief filed
03/06/1990Submitted
03/06/1990Submission
02/06/1990Submission
01/23/1990Motion to File DispMotion or Writ Granted
01/23/1990No Description Available.
01/22/1990Holding for Record
01/16/1990Motion for leave to file
01/12/1990Request for Oral Argument
01/12/1990Brief Filed
01/12/1990Case ready to be set
12/12/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/11/1989Request for Oral Argument
12/11/1989Brief Filed
12/04/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/16/1989Request for Oral Argument
11/16/1989Brief Filed
11/16/1989Brief Filed
11/16/1989Request for Oral Argument
11/14/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/03/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/17/1989No Description Available.
10/17/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/12/1989Motion to File DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/31/1989Holding for Record
08/28/1989Motion for leave to file
08/28/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/21/1988Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/18/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
4th District Court
Rusk
Honorable Donald R. Ross
87-03-118