judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals

Case: 07-89-00284-CV
07-89-00284-CV
08/28/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Commodore County Mutual Insurance Company
Tkacik, Martha
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/08/1991Mandate Issued
10/23/1991Case Returned from Higher Court
06/21/1991Case Forwarded to Higher Court
06/20/1991Writ of Habeas Corpus, Prohibition, Etc.
06/05/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
05/31/1991Response to any order, inquiry or motion
05/23/1991Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/08/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
02/27/1991Response to any order, inquiry or motion
02/20/1991Motion for Rehearing Filed
02/06/1991Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
12/10/1990Submitted
12/10/1990Submission
11/13/1990Submission
05/25/1990Brief Filed
05/25/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
11/13/1989Brief Filed
11/13/1989Case ready to be set
11/03/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
10/23/1989Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/09/1989Supplemental Brief Filed
10/03/1989Do not use
09/28/1989Motion to Supplement the Record DisposedGRANT
09/27/1989Brief Filed
09/27/1989Motion to Supplement the Record Filed
09/18/1989Motion for leave to file (miscellaneous)GRANT
09/08/1989Do not use
09/08/1989Do not use
09/05/1989Motion for leave to file (miscellaneous)
09/05/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedOverruled
08/28/1989Clerk`s Record and Reporter's Record Filed
08/28/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/25/1989Do not use
08/24/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
08/24/1989Motion for leave to file (miscellaneous)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/08/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Martha TkacikAppelleeC. R. Daffern
Commodore County MutualAppellantRandolph N. Wisener
Commodore County Mutual InsuraAppellantJune E. Higgins
Trial Court Information
47th District Court
Potter
Honorable David L. Gleason
72,531-A