judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1190-89
PD-1190-89
08/28/1989
PDR Case Type
WORTHEY, SANDRA FAYE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/05/1990BRIEF FILEDAppellant
12/06/1989BRIEF FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/22/1991MANDATE ISSD
03/06/1991OPINION ISSDReversed COA; Affirmed the Trial Court
11/29/1990SUPP TR FILED
05/16/1990SUBMITTED
02/28/1990SET FOR SUBMIS
01/05/1990BRIEF FILED
12/06/1989BRIEF FILED
11/08/1989PDR DISPGranted
09/28/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
08/28/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/22/1991STOREDCASE STORED
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateSteven C Hilbig
WORTHEY, SANDRA FAYEApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Steven C. Hilbig
Court of Appeals Information:
04-88-00510-CR
Rev & Rem 6-30-89
4th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
227th District Court
Bexar
Honorable Mike M. Machado
88CR2268