judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1191-89
PD-1191-89
08/28/1989
PDR Case Type
ROBERSON, WENDELL MORRIS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/20/1989FINAL DISP/REHEARRefused
12/20/1989REHEAR DISPDENIED
11/16/1989REHEAR FILED
11/01/1989PDR DISPRefused
09/28/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
08/28/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/22/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Roberson, Wendell MorrisApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Wendell Morris Roberson
STATE OF TEXASStateFred Rodriguez
Court of Appeals Information:
04-87-00081-CR
Aff 5-25-89
4th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
144th District Court
Bexar
Honorable SUSAN D. REED
86CR4322