judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00873-CR
01-89-00873-CR
08/28/1989
Felony DWI
Feehery, Leo Thomas
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/28/1991Mandate issued
01/12/1991No petition for review or writ of error was filed
12/28/1990Motion for rehearing was not filed
12/13/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
12/13/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
10/25/1990Submitted
10/25/1990Submission
10/25/1990Submitted
09/07/1990Submission
11/27/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
11/27/1989Case ready to be set
11/27/1989Case ready to be set
11/01/1989Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
10/02/1989Statement of facts filed
09/22/1989Transcript filed
08/28/1989Notice of appeal filed
08/28/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/03/1989Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/28/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - AppellantHon. Matthew Reue
StateCriminal - State of TexasJames R. Jones
Trial Court Information
County Court
Washington
89-143
$600 fin,30 dys pro