judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1200-89
PD-1200-89
08/29/1989
PDR Case Type
MILES, WILLIE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/29/1989RESPONSE FILEDAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/08/1989FINAL DISPRefused
12/08/1989MANDATE ISSD
11/22/1989OPINION ISSD - PRIOR OPINION WITHDRAWNRefused
11/22/1989PDR DISPRefused
11/22/1989REHEAR DISPGranted
10/02/1989REHEAR FILED
09/20/1989OPINION ISSDDismissed
08/29/1989PDR FILED
08/29/1989RESPONSE FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/08/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateDanny Hill
MILES, WILLIEApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Kay Davis
Jeff Blackburn
Court of Appeals Information:
07-89-00177-CR
Notice of Appeal Granted
7th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
320th District Court
Potter
Honorable Don Emerson
26,812-D