judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-01012-CR
05-89-01012-CR
08/28/1989
Theft
Clayton, Ray Charles
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/05/1990Mandate Issued
10/05/1990Mandate Issued
07/30/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
07/10/1990Response to Motion
07/05/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/25/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/25/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/06/1990Submission
06/06/1990Submitted
06/06/1990Submission
06/06/1990Submitted
04/11/1990MattConv
03/19/1990Letter Sent by the Court
02/20/1990Brief Filed
02/20/1990Case ready to be set
02/20/1990Case ready to be set
01/29/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/23/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/28/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/22/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/29/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/28/1989Brief Filed
11/28/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/01/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/30/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/27/1989Transcript Filed
09/08/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/28/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/11/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/03/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/05/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 5
Dallas
F89-95138-PL
40 yrs TDC