judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-01011-CR
05-89-01011-CR
08/28/1989
Felony DWI
Dees, Lonzie Lee
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/02/2020Order enteredDestroy
05/30/1990Mandate Issued
05/30/1990Mandate Issued
03/30/1990Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
03/30/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/30/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/28/1990Letter Sent by the Court
01/22/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/18/1990Brief Filed
01/18/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/02/1990Letter Filed
12/20/1989Brief Filed
11/28/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/22/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/27/1989Transcript Filed
09/08/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/28/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/02/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/07/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
01/18/1989Case ready to be set
01/18/1989Case ready to be set
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/02/2020Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 5
Dallas
F88-80087-NL
180days Jail & $400 Fine