judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF LAUB

Case Information: 36322
Short Caption:IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF LAUBCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Bar Matter - Discipline - Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/21/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/21/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record of Bar Proceedings. Vols. 1 through 6. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10649
07/13/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Intent to Contest Hearing Panel's Findings and Recommendations. 00-12121
07/18/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: August 21, 2000. 00-12380
08/21/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-14627
08/24/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The motion filed August 21, 2000, is granted. The appellant's opening brief shall be served and filed on or before September 20, 2000. 00-14845
08/25/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Response to Motion for Extension of Time for Opening Brief. (Notice of non-opposition; no action required. AH) 00-14989
09/20/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-16605
09/21/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. for Opening Brief. 00-16691
09/22/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time, to and including October 20, 2000, to file and serve the opening brief. We do not expect further requests for extensions of time absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 00-16761
10/16/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 50 pages. 00-18281
10/16/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 10/13/00. 00-18282
11/09/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: December 4, 2000. 00-19738
12/06/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 12/04/00. 00-21301
01/08/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 7, 2001. 01-00399
02/07/2001MotionFiled Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 36 pages. 01-02465
02/07/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: February 5, 2001. 01-02470
02/09/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Notice of Intent Not to Oppose Motion for Permission to File Reply Brief in Excess of Thirty Pages. 01-02673
01/09/2002Order/Dispositional BarFiled Bar Discipline Order. This is an automatic appeal from a Northern Nevada Disciplinary board hearing panel's recommendation that attorney Joe M. Laub be suspended for six moths, and that he be ordered to pay the costs of the disciplinary proceeding. We conclude that the hearing panel's recommendation should be approved. 'We suspend attorney Joe M. Laub from the practice of law for six months.' In addition, Laub shall pay the costs of the disciplinary proceeding. Laub and the state bar shall comply with SCR 115. We note that as the suspension is for no more than six months, Laub need not petition for reinstatement. EN BANC. Maupin, C.J., dissenting. 02-00502
01/24/2002Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from Lemons, Grundy & Eisenberg--check no. 31695.
01/24/2002Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Mailed on: hand delivered 01/24/02. 02-01615
01/24/2002MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Expedited Consideration of Petition for Rehearing. 02-01616
02/04/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. (Joe M. Laub). 02-02220
02/05/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40( c). fn1[We deny Laub's motion to expedite the decision on rehearing as moot in light of this order.] En Banc-Maupin, C.J., dissenting. 02-02363
02/14/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Service by Mail and Notice of Order to Public. 02-02956
02/20/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 through 6 this day. Returned Exhibits: Exhibit A--Exhibits offered by Joe M. Laub, and Exhibit B--Tape and Recorder this day. 02-02384
02/20/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/26/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 22, 2002. 02-02384