judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-01009-CV
05-89-01009-CV
08/28/1989
Mandamus
Mid-Century Insurance Company of Texas
Frank Andrews & John Street, Judge, 116th Dist. Ct. Dallas C
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
12/17/1997Record RetentionDestroy
08/29/1989Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/29/1989MattConv
08/29/1989Motion for Leave to File
08/29/1989Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
08/28/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
116th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Frank Andrews
89-4303-F