judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-89-01010-CR
05-89-01010-CR
08/28/1989
Marijuana Possession
Reyes, Ralph
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/04/1991Mandate Issued
04/04/1991Mandate Issued
03/25/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.
11/16/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FiledRefused
10/18/1990Record RetentionDestroy
10/18/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/18/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/17/1990Submitted
10/17/1990Submission
10/17/1990Submission
10/17/1990Submitted
08/20/1990MattConv
05/10/1990Brief Filed
05/10/1990Case ready to be set
05/10/1990Case ready to be set
04/13/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/13/1990Motion to Supplement Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/30/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/30/1990Motion to Supplement Record
03/22/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/19/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/21/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/20/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/22/1990Brief Filed
12/13/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/11/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/22/1989Statement of Facts Filed
11/13/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/10/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
10/26/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/24/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
10/05/1989Transcript Filed
08/28/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/10/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
08/10/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/04/1991Case StoredDestroy 25 yrs after date of final disposition
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 5
Dallas
F89-81239-VL
15 yrs TDC