judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-89-00874-CV
01-89-00874-CV
08/28/1989
Miscellaneous/other civil
Ted G. Walker & James D. Brunson
Mainland Savings Association, et al
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/14/2002Case stored
03/14/2002Mandate issued - criminal or civil
03/14/2002Mandate issued - criminal or civil
12/31/2001Writ Due
11/30/2001Motion for Rehearing Due
11/15/2001Opinion issuedDismissed
11/15/2001Opinion issuedDismissed
11/14/2001Submitted
11/14/2001Submission
11/14/2001Submitted
10/08/2001Case reinstated
10/08/2001Case reinstated
07/23/2001Response due to a motion or Court's Order.
06/21/2001Order enteredOtherwise disposed
03/25/1990Case stored
02/13/1990Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
01/25/1990Order enteredGrant motion
12/14/1989Order enteredGrant motion
12/14/1989Order enteredGrant motion
12/08/1989Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
12/01/1989Motion to transfer filed
11/29/1989Notice of dismissal
11/10/1989Docket statement received from party
11/10/1989Filing fee paid
10/24/1989Supplemental transcript filed
10/23/1989Transcript filed
10/05/1989Motion to extend time to file transcript dispGrant motion
09/25/1989Filing fee paid
09/21/1989Motion to extend time to file transcript
08/29/1989Notice of filing of notice of removal of cv actionOtherwise disposed
08/28/1989Motion for leave to fileNo action taken on motion
08/28/1989Motion to advance or accelerate appeal filedNo action taken on motion
08/28/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/14/2002Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellantTom F. Coleman
StateAppelleeBruce R. Coulombe
District Clerk, District District clerkCharles Bacarisse
StateAppellantThomas Lee Bartlett
Trial Court Information
190th District Court
Harris
Honorable WM B. AHDERS
85-04803-B