judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1201-89
PD-1201-89
08/29/1989
PDR Case Type
MARTINEZ, JOE LOUIS, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/22/1989FINAL DISPRefused
12/06/1989MOTIONDENIED
12/06/1989MOTION FILED
12/06/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/03/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
08/29/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/08/1990STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
MARTINEZ, JOE LOUISJR.Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Joe Louis Martinez, Jr.
STATE OF TEXASStateRandall Sherrod
Court of Appeals Information:
07-88-00175-CR
Aff 5-22-89
7th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
47th District Court
Randall
Honorable DAVID L. GLEASON
6008-A