judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals

Case: PD-1193-89
PD-1193-89
08/28/1989
PDR Case Type
TERRELL, KENNETH L.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/28/1989FINAL DISPRefused
11/08/1989PDR DISPRefused
09/28/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
08/28/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/05/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateFred Rodriguez
Terrell, Kenneth L.Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Julie B. Pollock
Court of Appeals Information:
04-87-00633-CR
Aff 7-12-89
4th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
187th District Court
Bexar
Honorable PAT PRIEST
87CR2486