judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-6445
B-6445
12/16/1976
Application for Writ of Error
ARCHER PARR
BONNIE M. WHITE, ADMINISTRATRIX, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/07/1977Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/27/1977Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/26/1977Response to PetitionRespondent
12/16/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/11/1977Response to Motion filed
07/07/1977Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/27/1977Reply to Response
04/26/1977Response to Petition
03/24/1977Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
03/14/1977Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
12/28/1976Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
12/16/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/16/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bonnie M. White, Administratrix, et al.Respondent
Archer ParrPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information