judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-6467
B-6467
12/29/1976
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF HOUSTON
MGJ CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/06/1977Motion for Rehearing
06/21/1977Response to Brief filedRespondent
06/15/1977Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
01/12/1977Response to PetitionRespondent
12/29/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/06/1977Motion for Rehearing
06/21/1977Response to Brief filed
06/15/1977Supplemental Brief filed
01/12/1977Response to Petition
12/29/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/29/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
MGJ CorporationRespondent
City of HoustonPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information