judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-6436
B-6436
12/09/1976
Application for Writ of Error
EARL F. GATHERS
WALPACE COMPANY, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/15/1977Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/02/1977Reply to ResponsePetitioner
12/23/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
12/09/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/22/1977Response to Motion filed
02/15/1977Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/02/1977Reply to Response
12/23/1976Response to Petition
12/09/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/09/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Earl F. GathersPetitioner
Walpace Company, Inc.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information