judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-6438
B-6438
12/09/1976
Application for Writ of Error
GENE MESHWERT
BETTY MESHWERT
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/11/1977Response to PetitionPetitioner
12/28/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
12/15/1976Amended PetitionRespondent
12/09/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
12/09/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/30/1977Concurring Opinion issued.
03/30/1977Opinion issued
02/11/1977Response to Petition
01/26/1977Document received (See Remarks)
01/26/1977Document received (See Remarks)
01/26/1977Document received (See Remarks)
01/26/1977Document received (See Remarks)
01/26/1977Document received (See Remarks)
12/28/1976Response to Petition
12/15/1976Amended Petition
12/09/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/09/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/09/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Gene MeshwertPetitioner
Betty MeshwertRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information