judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-6432
B-6432
12/08/1976
Application for Writ of Error
VICTORIA ANN LINDOP, INDIVIDUALLY AS NEXT FRIEND OF HER MINOR CHILDREN, ET AL.
ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/07/1977Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/30/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
12/09/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
12/08/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/11/1977Response to Motion filed
04/07/1977Response to Motion filed
04/07/1977Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/30/1976Response to Petition
12/09/1976Response to Petition
12/08/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/08/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Allstate Insurance CompanyRespondent
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance CompanyRespondent
Victoria Ann Lindop, individually as Next Friend of her minor children, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information