judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-6431
B-6431
12/08/1976
Application for Writ of Error
WESLEY WEST, ET AL.
EXXON CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/17/1977Response to Brief filedRespondent
03/15/1977Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
03/02/1977Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
03/02/1977Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/17/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
12/08/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/17/1977Response to Brief filed
03/15/1977Supplemental Brief filed
03/09/1977Response to Motion filed
03/07/1977Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
03/04/1977Miscellaneous Motion
03/02/1977Brief in Support of Petition
03/02/1977Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/17/1976Response to Petition
12/08/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/08/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Exxon CorporationRespondent
Wesley West, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information