judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-6428
B-6428
12/07/1976
Application for Writ of Error
A. J. MOORE
CITY OF CORPUS CHRISTI AND BILL G. READ
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/02/1977Motion for RehearingPetitioner
12/28/1976Reply to ResponsePetitioner
12/22/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
12/07/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/27/1977Opinion issued
02/27/1977Motion to ExpediteFiling granted
02/07/1977Response to Motion filed
02/02/1977Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/28/1976Reply to Response
12/22/1976Motion to ExpediteFiling granted
12/22/1976Response to Petition
12/07/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/07/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
A. J. MoorePetitioner
City of Corpus Christi and Bill G. ReadRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information