judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-6468
B-6468
12/29/1976
Application for Writ of Error
BURTIS R. HAMMONDS AND NORMA HAMMONDS, WIFE, INDIVIDUALLY AND DBA GARDEN CENTER AND FLOWER SHOP
ED HOLMES AND ZANE STITES, CORSICANA NATIONAL BANK
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/29/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
01/24/1977Response to PetitionRespondent
01/12/1977Brief on the MeritsRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/29/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
11/30/1977Letter Filed
11/09/1977Dissenting opinion issued.
11/09/1977Opinion issued
03/02/1977Document received (See Remarks)
03/02/1977Document received (See Remarks)
03/02/1977Document received (See Remarks)
01/24/1977Response to Petition
01/12/1977Brief on the Merits
12/29/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ed Holmes and Zane StitesRespondent
Burtis R. Hammonds and Norma Hammonds, wife, individually and dba Garden Center and Flower ShopPetitioner
CORSICANA NATIONAL BANKRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information