judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-6463
B-6463
12/28/1976
Application for Writ of Error
STATE OF TEXAS
DAN TURNER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/07/1977Motion for RehearingRespondent
03/31/1977Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
01/10/1977Response to PetitionRespondent
12/28/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/27/1978Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed.
10/14/1977Response to Motion filed
10/07/1977Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/27/1977Opinion issued
03/31/1977Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/03/1977Letter Filed
03/01/1977Document received (See Remarks)
01/26/1977Document received (See Remarks)
01/26/1977Document received (See Remarks)
01/10/1977Response to Petition
12/28/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/28/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dan TurnerRespondent
Texas District Branch of the American Psychiatric AssociationAmicus Curiae
State of TexasPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information