judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-6462
B-6462
12/28/1976
Application for Writ of Error
ARCHER PARR, J AND J OPERATING COMPANY
BONNIE M. WHITE, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/15/1977Reply to ResponsePetitioner
06/29/1977Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/02/1977Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/02/1977Reply to ResponsePetitioner
04/26/1977Response to PetitionRespondent
01/04/1977Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
12/28/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/15/1977Reply to Response
07/12/1977Response to Motion filed
06/29/1977Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/22/1977Opinion issued
05/02/1977Reply to Response
05/02/1977Reply to Response
04/26/1977Response to Petition
03/24/1977Notice of Appearance
03/14/1977Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
01/04/1977Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/28/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/28/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
J and J Operating CompanyPetitioner
Bonnie M. White, et al.Respondent
Archer ParrPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information