judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICCIARDELLI VS. OUSLEY

Case Information: 31355
Short Caption:RICCIARDELLI VS. OUSLEYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A356290Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:11/20/1997 / Combs, E.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/27/2000How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/13/1997Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. (John Peter Lee-check no. 26171).
11/13/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
11/20/1997Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Of Settlement Conference. Settlement Judge: E. Leslie Combs. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
01/14/1998MotionFiled Motion. For Leave to File Docketing Statement.
01/14/1998Docketing StatementReceived Docketing Statement.
01/20/1998Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Granting the motion filed January 14, 1998. The docketing statement provisionally submitted on January 14, 1998, shall be filed, forthwith.
01/20/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
01/29/1998Other Other. Filed Response to Docketing Statement.
02/20/1998Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Settlement Conference Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
03/04/1998MotionFiled Motion. To Dismiss Appeal or in the alternative for leave to file Counter-Appeal.
03/12/1998MotionFiled Motion. Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal, or in the Alternative, for Leave to File Counter-Appeal.
07/31/1998MotionFiled Motion. To Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Respondents.
12/08/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Respondents' motion to dismiss is denied as to the appeal from the October 29, 1996, order granting an injunction. Respondents' alternative motion to file a cross-appeal is also denied. That portion of the appeal pertaining to the October 7, 1997, order denying the motion to alter or amend is dismissed. Appellants shall have 20 days in which to show cause why the appeal from the March 4, 1997, order reducing the attorneys' fee award should not be dismissed. The motion of counsel for respondent's to withdraw is granted. Counsel for repondents shall promptly serve a copy of this order upon respondents as well as opposing counsel, and shall file proof of such service with the clerk of this court within 10 days of the date of this order. Respondents shall have 30 days from the date of this order to retain new counsel to represent them in the pending proceedings and to cause counsel to enter an appearance with the clerk of this court. The briefing schedule and preparation of transcripts in this appeal shall remain suspended pending further order of this court.
12/28/1998Other Other. Filed Appellants Response to the court's Order to Show Cause dated December 8, 1998.
01/11/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Of Appearance. Bell, Lukens & Kent and John P. Lukens as counsel for respondents.
02/01/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Appellants filed a lengthy and singularly unhelpful response on December 28, 1998. 1[Appellants appear to have used the response as a vehicle to request additional relief from this court in the form of an order to the district court to enforce the injunction. Appellants' request is denied, without prejudice to appellants' abililty to seek relief through proper channels. Future violations of our rules will result in sanctions.] Appellants shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file a response limited to 3 pages and shall also show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. The briefing schedule and transcripts shall remain suspended pending further order of this court.
02/18/1999Other Other. Filed Response to Order Filed February 1, 1999. (Mailed 2/16/99).
04/13/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. 1[Our February 1, 1999, order also required appellants to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed for what appeared to be a misrepresentation in the docketing statement. We conclude that the statement was inaccurate, but that it did not rise to the level of disregard sanctioned in KDI Sylvan Pools v. Workman, 107 Nev. 340, 810 P.2d 1217 (1991), and therefore, we will refrain from imposing sanctions]. We deny the motion to dismiss the appeal from the order reducing the attorneys fee award. Appellants shall have 15 days from the date of this order to comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(a) and 120 days to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1).
05/03/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporter: Yvonne Valentin.
05/04/1999Other Other. Filed Receipt of Copy of Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporter: Yvonne Valentin.
07/22/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Certified Copy of Transcript of Proceedings. 3/14/96, 4/4/96, 4/23/96, 4/24/96. Court Reporter: Yvonne M. Valentin.
08/10/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: 8/6/99).
08/10/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. To Appellant's Opening Brief, Volumes 1 and 2.
09/07/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Respondent may have to and including September 21, 1999 to file the answering brief.
09/22/1999BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: Fed-Ex 9/21/99).
09/22/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. To Respondent's Answering Brief.
10/25/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Appellant may have to and including November 8, 1999, within which to file the reply brief.
11/12/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: 11/8/99). (Recv'd. original + 3 copies, one returned.)
11/12/1999AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Reply Appendix. (Recv'd. original + 1, one returned.)
11/16/1999Other Other. Filed Amended Certificate of Mailing.
01/27/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein.
01/27/2000Other Other. Case stands submitted on the record and briefs this day.
01/27/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/08/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. The district court's order reducing the attorney fees is supported by its finding that the Ricciardellis were partially at fault for the dispute, having failed to organize the homeowners' association pursuant to the CC&Rs. " . . . we affirm the orders of the district court." SNP00A-1-RR/CY/NB 00-21471
12/18/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. of Record for Appellants. (Law firm of John Peter Lee, Ltd.) 00-22022
01/03/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-21532
01/03/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/20/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 9, 2001. 00-21532