judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LEROY J. OVERTON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1355
Short Caption:LEROY J. OVERTON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-4383-07Filed Date:10/28/2010

Opening Event Date:10/28/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/07/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/26/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/09/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/26/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLeroy J. Overton YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Kristina L. AmentYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/28/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/17/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Matthew Leefer, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
11/17/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Matthew Leefer, Esquire
12/03/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
01/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (18 pgs/Peterson-Hart) 12/13/07 proc.
01/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (8 pgs/tape) 4/15/08 proc.
01/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (10 pgs/tape) 7/3/08 proc.
01/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (274 pgs/Pirfo) 5/13,17-18/10 proc.
01/19/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
02/01/2011RECORD COPIES
02/01/2011RECORD INDEX
02/25/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 40 days after preparation of transcript (no oppo).
03/07/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (42 pgs/Peteroson-Hart) 12/13/07 proc.
03/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (62 pgs/Peterson-Jones) 1/25/08 proc. w/cd
03/23/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, wherein appellant indicate(s) that transcript is being prepared, and it appearing that the transcripts have been filed with this court and are available for review, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30(f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
05/02/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 50 days to June 21, 2011 (no oppo).
05/10/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 21, 2011. (Castillo)
06/20/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until July 26, 2011 (no oppo)
06/24/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and limited appendix before July 26, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (Castillo)
07/26/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
07/26/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
08/24/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief 30 Days (Appellee)
08/30/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief on 9/26/11.
09/26/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
09/26/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/24/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/09/2012FiledSubmitted to Blackburne-Rigsby, Thompson, Steadman
03/02/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Steadman, Senior Judge.)
03/14/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
03/26/2012FiledMandate