judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IRA GEORGE TUCKER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0185)
Case Number:S-08-0185Case Docketed On:08/26/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:IRA GEORGE TUCKER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:IRA GEORGE TUCKER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantIra George TuckerDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure
Opinion Number:2009 WY 107
Citation:214 P.3d 236 (Wyo. 2009).

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/26/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/26/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/26/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/10/2008Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/10/2008Event - Hardcopy received - motion for extension of time to file briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/13/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/25/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/25/2008Event - Hardcopy received motion for extension of timeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/26/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/31/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/31/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/10/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/11/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/03/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/05/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
03/05/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/05/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/16/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/18/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina Kerin for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/23/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jenny L. Craig for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/25/2009Notice-Incoming - Additional authorityNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
03/26/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Additional AuthorityEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/22/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina N. Kerin, Appellate Counsel for appellant; Jenny Lynn Craig, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/22/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/25/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/10/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/10/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/10/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/10/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/14/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 9/11/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal