judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9210
A-9210
08/20/1962
Application for Writ of Error
TARRY MOVING ANDS STORAGE CO., INC., ET AL.
RAILROAD COMMISSION OF TEXAS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/16/1963Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/25/1963Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
02/23/1963Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
09/14/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
08/20/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/16/1963Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/03/1963Dissenting opinion issued.
04/03/1963Opinion issued
02/25/1963Supplemental Brief filed
02/23/1963Brief on the Merits
01/30/1963Document received (See Remarks)
01/30/1963Document received (See Remarks)
09/14/1962Response to Petition
08/20/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
08/20/1962Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Railroad Commission of Texas, et al.Respondent
Tarry Moving ands Storage Co., Inc., et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information