judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9211
A-9211
08/20/1962
Application for Writ of Error
LEWIS A. SALES
BACHMAN CENTER CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/18/1962Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/29/1962Reply to ResponsePetitioner
08/25/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
08/20/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/23/1962Response to Motion filed
10/18/1962Motion for RehearingOverruled
08/29/1962Reply to Response
08/25/1962Response to Petition
08/20/1962Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/20/1962Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lewis A. SalesPetitioner
Bachman Center CorporationRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information