judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9208
A-9208
08/17/1962
Application for Writ of Error
TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPAMY
BOBBY JOE HURST
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/02/1963Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/29/1962Reply to ResponsePetitioner
10/11/1962Amended Response to Petition for Review filedRespondent
09/26/1962Amended PetitionPetitioner
08/25/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
08/17/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/13/1963Response to Motion filed
05/02/1963Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/29/1962Reply to Response
10/11/1962Amended Response to Petition for Review filed
09/26/1962Amended Petition
08/25/1962Response to Petition
08/17/1962Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/17/1962Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bobby Joe HurstRespondent
Travelers Insurance CompamyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information