judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9237
A-9237
09/24/1962
Application for Writ of Error
CLEVELAND A. SKATES
CITY OF PARIS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/17/1962Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
12/07/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
10/05/1962Response to PetitionRespondent
09/24/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/09/1963Opinion issued
12/17/1962Brief in Support of Petition
12/07/1962Response to Petition
11/14/1962Document received (See Remarks)
10/05/1962Response to Petition
09/24/1962Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
09/24/1962Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Cleveland A. SkatesPetitioner
City of Paris, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information