judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

FULTZ (MICHAEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36332
Short Caption:FULTZ (MICHAEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33463 , 35153 , 40173 , 43782 , 45385 , 46642 , 47394 , 48149 , 50034 , 52183 , 62750 , 71943 , 71943-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C117962Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/21/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/22/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/22/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10694
08/04/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Records due: 120 days. fn1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 36313, 36332, 36336, 36338, 36343, 36374, 36396. Document No. 00-13561.
11/21/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 8. 00-20468
11/21/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/16/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn7[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-19187
03/13/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40( c). fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-04558
03/28/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-04610
03/28/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/15/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 2, 2002. 02-04610
11/13/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Denied. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed June 7, 2002 and placed on the docket as Case No. 02-7307 (no action required). 02-19475
01/21/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. The petition for a writ of ceritorari is denied. (No action required.) 03-01036