judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GENERAL SHALE BRICK, INC. v. SOL LAND DEVELOPMENT, a Limited Liability Company

Case Heading (S-08-0178)
Case Number:S-08-0178Case Docketed On:08/18/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Goshen CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:GENERAL SHALE BRICK, INC. v. SOL LAND DEVELOPMENT, a Limited Liability Company
Full Title:GENERAL SHALE BRICK, INC., Appellant (Defendant), v. SOL LAND DEVELOPMENT, a Limited Liability Company, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGeneral Shale Brick, Inc.Mistee Lyn Elliott
AppelleeSOL Land Development, LLCMichael E. Warren

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/18/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/18/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/18/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/18/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/03/2008Motion - Dismiss - involuntary with memorandum in support of motion.MotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
09/04/2008Event - Hardcopy received motion to dismissEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/24/2008Order - Dismiss - involuntaryOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
10/10/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal