judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MONROE A/K/A HOYT (DAIMON) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36333
Short Caption:MONROE A/K/A HOYT (DAIMON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36415
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C137115Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Maupin for Justice LeavittPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/22/2000OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Sat in district court proceedings.
06/22/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/22/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10695
07/05/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption.
07/14/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Modification of Caption. (Second Notice).
12/18/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Order of Affirmance in Docket No. 36333 and Administratively Closing Docket No. 36415. fn4[Docket No. 36333 is a proper person appeal from the district court's oral decision to deny his habeas corpus petition. Docket No. 36415 is a proper person appeal from the district court's written order denying his habeas corpus petition. Because appellant filed two separate notices of appeal, the clerk of this court inadvertently opened two separate cases. We direct the clerk of this court to administratively close Docket No. 36415.] We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' SNP02-WM/CY/DA 01-21280
01/15/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-00573
01/15/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/01/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 17, 2002. 02-00573