Case Heading (S-08-0179) | |||||
Case Number: | S-08-0179 | Case Docketed On: | 08/18/2008 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Third Judicial District Uinta County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509 | ||
Short Title: | RANDALL BRITTON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | RANDALL BRITTON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Randall Britton | Diane M. Lozano Tina N. Olson Kirk Allan Morgan |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Bruce A. Salzburg Terry L. Armitage D. Michael Pauling Cathleen D. Parker |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Criminal Law -Sentencing, Sentencing, Trial |
Opinion Number: | 2009 WY 91 |
Citation: | 211 P.3d 514 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
08/18/2008 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
08/18/2008 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
08/18/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
08/25/2008 | Notice-Incoming - Other - Index from district court clerk | Notice-Incoming | Other | Final | |
10/06/2008 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
10/06/2008 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
11/19/2008 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
11/19/2008 | Event - Hardcopy received Brief of Appellee and received copy of designation of record. Counsel will file amended certificate of service to reflect today's filing date | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
11/19/2008 | Service - Certificate of service | Service | Certificate of service | Final | |
11/20/2008 | Event - Hardcopy received - Amended Certifiate of Service for Brief of Appellee | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
11/21/2008 | Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
11/21/2008 | Notice-Internal - Veto | Notice-Internal | Veto | Final | |
12/08/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
12/22/2008 | Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record transmittal notice from district court | Final | |
12/22/2008 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volumes I-II, original papers; Volume III, transcripts. | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
12/22/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
01/09/2009 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
01/13/2009 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kirk Morgan for appellant. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
01/21/2009 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Cathleen Parker for appellee. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
02/18/2009 | Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Kirk Allan Morgan, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Cathleen D. Parker, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement. | Event | Oral argument presented | Final | |
02/18/2009 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
07/15/2009 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, but remanded for the limited purpose of correcting the written judgment and sentence. Justice Burke writing for the court. | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
07/31/2009 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
07/31/2009 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
07/31/2009 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
07/31/2009 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
08/05/2009 | Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 8/3/09. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |