judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: STEPHEN D. LANDFIELD

Case Information: 10-BG-1337
Short Caption:IN RE: STEPHEN D. LANDFIELDClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Reciprocal
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN47-10Filed Date:11/01/2010

Opening Event Date:11/01/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Wallace E. Shipp NN
Joseph Charles PerryNY
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentStephen D. Landfield NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/01/2010DISCIPLINARY LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with a certified copy of an order of the Supreme Court of New Jersey suspending respondent for six months, retroactive to July 27, 2006. Respondent is already under disciplinary suspension based on a separate reciprocal matter from New Jersey, in which the court imposed a six-month suspension with fitness.
11/12/2010RECEIVED from the Office of Bar Counsel a copy of a letter to respondent advising respondent of the proposed recommendation to the court that respondent be suspended pursuant to D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 11 (d), and of his obligation to file an affidavit in compliance with D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14.
11/15/2010ORDER Having received a certified copy of an order of the Supreme Court of New Jersey suspending respondent from the practice of law for six months, it is, accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 11 (d), ORDERED that respondent is suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia pending final disposition of this proceeding, effective on the date of entry of this order, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent show cause within thirty days why he should not be suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia for six months, with his reinstatement conditioned upon a showing of fitness. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel shall reply to respondent's response no later than fifteen days after service of the response. Alternatively, no later than fifteen days after resp;ondent's response was due, Bar Counsel may object to the imposition of reciprocal discipline based upon the factors set forth in D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 11 (c). Bar Counsel shall provide the court with the relevant portions of the record of the proceeding in the other disciplining court, the statute and rules that governed it, and a short statement identifying all of the issues that the matter presents. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if Bar Counsel opposes the imposition of identical discipline, Bar Counsel shall (1) recommend appropriate non-identical discipline or (2) request that the matter be referred to the Board for its recommendation as to discipline. Respondent may reply within ten days after service of Bar Counsel's submission. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's attentiion is drawn to the requirement of Rule XI, Sec 14 relating to suspended attorneys and to the provisions of Rule XI, Sec 16 (c) dealing with the timing of eligibility for reinstatement as related to compliance with Rule XI, Sec 14, including the filing of the required affidavit. (ETW)
11/17/2010LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel advising the court that the notification to the court on November 1, 2010, advising that respondent had been suspended in New Jersey was returned. Respondent secondary address listed with the D.C. Bar is as follows: 24 Joyce Drive, Succasunna, NJ 07076
12/29/2010STATEMENT of Bar Counsel regarding reciprocal discipline
01/04/2011TMC - OTSC - statement of Bar Counsel - proposed order
01/13/2011SUSPENSION ORDERED that Stephen D. Landfield, Esquire, is hereby suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia for a period of six months with reinstatement conditioned on a showing of fitness. The six month suspension shall be served consecutively to his earlier suspension. It is FURTHER ORDERED that for purposes of reinstatement respondent's suspension will not begin to run until such time as he files an affidavit that fully complies with the requirements of D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g) and completes the suspension imposed pursuant to In re Landfield, 955 A.2d 150 (D.C. 2008). (BR,TE,FA)
01/18/2011RECEIVED from the Office of Bar Counsel a corrected certificate of service as to Bar Counsel's statement regarding reciprocal discipline.
01/26/2011RECEIVED from the Office of Bar Counsel a notice of nonfiling by respondent the required affidavit pursuant to D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14.