judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2284
A-2284
06/13/1949
Application for Writ of Error
CASEY JONES
C. N. MARSH, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/15/1949Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/27/1949Response to PetitionRespondent
06/13/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/22/1949Response to Motion filed
11/15/1949Motion for Rehearing
11/02/1949Opinion issued
07/06/1949Document received (See Remarks)
07/06/1949Document received (See Remarks)
06/27/1949Response to Petition
06/13/1949Motion for Extension of Time to File Response
06/13/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/13/1949Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
C. N. Marsh, et al.Respondent
Casey JonesPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information