judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JONES (CHRISTOPHER) VS. STATE

Case Information: 30756
Short Caption:JONES (CHRISTOPHER) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 43554 , 45962 , 52503 , 53946 , 54863 , 55041 , 55106 , 62323 , 74459
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C128425Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/12/1997How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/18/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/18/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Note: Originally submitted on July 11, 1997, with no Notice of Appeal.)
07/29/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. The district court clerk shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.]
12/12/1997Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2.
12/12/1997Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/15/1997BriefReceived Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief.
09/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We have reviewed the record on appeal, and for the reasons stated in the attached order of the district court, conclude that appellant's contentions lack merit and that the district court properly denied appellant's petition and motion. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP00A-RR/MS/DA 00-15913
12/29/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP00A-RR/MS/DA 00-22708
01/17/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-22746
01/17/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/20/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 19, 2001. 00-22746