judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2286
A-2286
06/13/1949
Application for Writ of Error
RESERVE PETROLEUM CO., ET AL.
E. M. HARP AND BETH POOL HARP, STANOLIND OIL AND GAS COMPANY, E. M. HARP, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/10/1949Brief on the MeritsRespondent
10/07/1949Brief on the MeritsRespondent
06/27/1949Supplement to ResponseRespondent
06/24/1949Reply to ResponsePetitioner
06/23/1949Response to PetitionRespondent
06/13/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/08/1950Opinion issued
10/10/1949Brief on the Merits
10/07/1949Brief on the Merits
07/06/1949Document received (See Remarks)
07/06/1949Document received (See Remarks)
06/27/1949Supplement to Response
06/24/1949Reply to Response
06/23/1949Response to Petition
06/13/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/13/1949Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
E. M. Harp, et al.Respondent
E. M. Harp and Beth Pool HarpRespondent
Reserve Petroleum Co., et al.Petitioner
Stanolind Oil and Gas CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information