judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2280
A-2280
06/08/1949
Application for Writ of Error
MINA SEVINE
BERTHA HEISSNER, BERTHA HEISSNER, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/14/1949Motion for RehearingRespondent
10/01/1949Brief on the MeritsRespondent
08/04/1949Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
06/08/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/08/1951Letter Filed
11/17/1949Response to Motion filed
11/14/1949Motion for Rehearing
11/02/1949Opinion issued
10/01/1949Brief on the Merits
08/04/1949Brief on the Merits
07/06/1949Document received (See Remarks)
07/06/1949Document received (See Remarks)
06/08/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/08/1949Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bertha HeissnerRespondent
Mina SevinePetitioner
Bertha Heissner, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information