judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JACKSON VS. CITY OF NORTH LAS VEGAS C/W 29305

Case Information: 30995
Short Caption:JACKSON VS. CITY OF NORTH LAS VEGAS C/W 29305Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 29305 *, 30995Related Case(s): 38972 , 43367 , 44231 , 44457 , 44876
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A366925Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/31/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/08/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/08/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
09/11/1997MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. With leave of Court to Proceed in Forma Pauperis on Appeal (Original only).
09/22/1997Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Received Proper Person amended Motion with leave of court to proceed in Forma Pauperis on Appeal. (Original only.)
09/25/1997MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. To proceed in Proper Person on Appeal (original only).
10/08/1997Other Other. Received Objection to Statement of the evidence or proceedings when no report was made or when the transcript is unavailable.clerk14
10/30/1997Other Other. Filed North Las Vegas Housing Authority's Joinder in Defendants Clark County School District Board of Trustee, Jeffrey L. Burr, James B. McMillan, Dan Newburn, Jose Soloria, Lois Tarkanian and Judy Witt's objection to Statement of the evidence of proceedings when no report was made or when the transcript is unavailable.
11/03/1997Other Other. Filed City of North Las Vegas; North Las Vegas Police Department's Joinder in Defendants Clark County School District Board of Trustees, Jeffrey L. Burr, James B. McMillan, Dan Newburn, Jose Solorio, Lois Tarkanian and Judy Witt's objection to Statement of the evidence or proceedings when no report was made or when the transcript is unavailable.
12/11/1997Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Received statement of the evidence or proceedings when no report was made or when the transcript is unavailable documents.
12/18/1997MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. To file Appellant's Opening Brief in excess of thirty pages.
12/18/1997MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. For extension of time to file Appellant's Opening Brief.
01/06/1998MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. To consolidate Appeals and or Motion to Amend Appeal.
01/06/1998BriefReceived Proper Person Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief.
01/12/1998MotionFiled Motion to Strike. Petitioner/Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Appeals and /or Motion to amend Appeal and Opening Brief.
01/15/1998MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. To proceed in Proper Person on Appeal Supplemental Information.
01/20/1998Other Other. Filed North Las Vegas Housing Authority's Joinder in Defendants Clark County School District Board of Trustees, Jeffrey L. Burr, James B. McMillan, Dan Newburn, Jose Solorio, Lois Tarkanian and Judy Witt's Motion to Strike Petitioner/Appellant's Motion to consolidate Appeals and/or Motion to amend Appeal and Opening Brief.
01/20/1998Other Other. Filed Clark County School District, Brian Cram, Linda Gibson and Howard Hollingsworth's Joinder in Motion to Strike Petitioner/Appellant's Motion to consolidate Appeals and/or Motion to amend Appeal and Opening Brief.
01/20/1998MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. To Strike Defendants CCSD, Board of Trustees' Motion to Strike Petitioner/Appellant's Motion to Consolidate Appeals and/or Motion to amend Appeal and Opening Brief. (Nos. 29305 and 30995).
01/26/1998MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. To Strike Defendants' Joinders in Motion to Strike Petitioner/Appellant's Motion to consolidate Appeals and /or Motion to amend Appeal and Opening Brief (nos. 29305 and 30995).
01/28/1998Other Other. Received Reply to Motion to Strike Defendants CCSD, Board of Trustees' Motion to Strike Petitioner/Appellant's Motion to consolidate Appeals and/or Motion to amend Appeal and Opening Brief.clerk14
01/30/1998MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. To Strike Defendants' Motions and Joinders in Motion to Strike Petitioner/Appellant's Motion to consolidate Appeals and/or Motion to amend Appeal and Opening Brief (nos. 29305 and 30995).
01/30/1998MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. To proceed in Proper Person on Appeal/Supplemental Information Addendum (nos. 29305 and 30995).
02/11/1998Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Objection to reply to Motion to strike Defendants CCSD, Board of Trustees' Motion to Strike Petition/Appellant's Motion to consolidate Appeals and/or Motion to amend Appeal and Opening Brief. (Nos. 29305 and 30995).
02/11/1998Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Statement of the Evidence of proceedings when no report was made or when the transcript is unavailable documents.
07/14/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. 00-12208
07/17/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. John S. Delikanakis substituting as attorney for North Las Vegas Housing Authority in place of Leland Eugene Backus. Nos. 29305, 30995. 00-12337
09/14/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 00-16260
10/10/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. (copy) from Clark County School District addressed to Jo Ann Jackson, informng her that Stephanie Barker no longer works in that office, and directing her to send all further correspondence to General Counsel, Clark County School District. Nos. 29305/30995. Doc. No. 00-17885
10/12/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Deputy D.A. Ann Bersi. She has been assigned as counsel for Clark County School District Board of Trustees. 00-18073
10/31/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Volumes 1 through 3. 00-19159
10/31/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/29/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Consolidating Appeals and Directing Responses. Although appellant Jo Ann Jackson was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, she has requested that both appeals be consolidated. Having reviewed the record in each appeal, we conclude that consolidation is warranted, and we hereby consolidate the above-entitled matters for all appellate purposes. Respondents shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve their respective response indicating why this court should affirm the district court's orders. fn13[No extensions of time to file the responses shall be permitted absent extreme and unforeseeable circumstances.] The responses must comply with Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure 28, 30, 31, and 32. Nos. 29305/30995. (01-05489)
05/02/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Respondents' Joint Ex Parte Motion for an Order Extending the time to Respond to Issues Raised in the Court's Order filed March 29, 2001. Nos. 29305/30995. (01-07334)
05/03/2001Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Request for Injunctive Relief and a Restraining Order. Nos. 29305/30995 (01-07464).
05/07/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On May 2, 2001, respondents filed a "Joint Ex Parte Motion For an Order Extending the Time to Respond to Issues Raised in the Court's Order filed March 29, 2001." fn1[Respondents' joint motion having been deposited in the Supreme Court drop box on April 30, 2001, the motion was timely.] Respondents shall file and serve their response on or before May 21, 2001. Failure to fully comply with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions against counsel. We do not expect any further delays in the prosecution of this appeal. Nos. 29305/30995. (01-07545)
05/09/2001Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Supplemental Information to Request for Injunctive Relief and a Restraining Order. Nos. 29305/30995. (01-07785)
05/22/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Respondents' Joint Response to Issues Raised in the Court's Order Filed March 29, 2001. Nos. 29305/30995 (01-08550)
05/22/2001AppendixFiled Appendix. Respondents' Appendix, Vols 1 and 2. Nos. 29305/30995 (01-08553)
06/11/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand (Docket No. 29305); Order Dismissing Appeal (Docket No. 30995). Pursuant to NRAP 3(b), these two appeals were consolidated. ' . . . we dismiss the appeal in Docket No. 30995 for lack of appellate jurisdiction.' fn22[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper persons documents received from appellant. Given our disposition of these consolidated appeals, we deny as moot the numerous additional requests for relief interspersed within the proper person documents received from appellant.] SNP01A-CY/ML/NB. Nos. 29305/30995. 01-09688
07/09/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 through 3 this day. 01-10306
07/09/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/26/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 11, 2001. 01-10306