judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LAMAR ADVERTISING, a South Dakota corporation, authorized to do business in Wyoming v. LARRY and VICKIE NICHOLLS, L.L.C., a Wyoming limited liability company

Case Heading (S-08-0188)
Case Number:S-08-0188Case Docketed On:08/27/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:LAMAR ADVERTISING, a South Dakota corporation, authorized to do business in Wyoming v. LARRY and VICKIE NICHOLLS, L.L.C., a Wyoming limited liability company
Full Title:LAMAR ADVERTISING, a South Dakota corporation, authorized to do business in Wyoming, Appellant (Defendant), v. LARRY and VICKIE NICHOLLS, L.L.C., a Wyoming limited liability company, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLamar Advertising, a South Dakota corporation authorized to do business in WyomingTimothy M. Stubson
Orintha Elizabeth Karns
AppelleeLARRY and VICKIE NICHOLS, L.L.C., a Wyoming limited liability companyFrank R. Chapman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Property - Real, Property -Servitudes
Opinion Number:2009 WY 96
Citation:213 P.3d 641 (Wyo. 2009)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/27/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/27/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/27/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/27/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/14/2008Brief - Appellant and statement of costs.BriefAppellantFinal
10/16/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/01/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/02/2008Event - Hardcopy received Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/19/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
12/19/2008Event - Phone Call to counsel for appellants; the reply brief is in the queue, but due to problems with system, it could not be accepted for filing before 5:00 p.m. Advised that brief will be considered timely filed when it moved by system to acceptance queueEventPhone CallFinal
12/22/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Reply brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/22/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/07/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
02/11/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/13/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Orintha E. Karns for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/24/2009Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
02/25/2009Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
02/26/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Vacate Oral ArgumentEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/16/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/18/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgments - oral argument setting - Orintha Karns for appellant; Frank Chapman for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/23/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Orintha Elizabeth Karns for appellant; Frank R. Chapman for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/23/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/11/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/27/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/27/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/27/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/27/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/02/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 9/1/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal