judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DARTAE JAVAUHN HUNTER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1358
Short Caption:DARTAE JAVAUHN HUNTER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM409-10Filed Date:10/28/2010

Opening Event Date:10/28/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/05/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/05/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDartae Javaughn Hunter YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Sarah J. Schall NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/28/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/09/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that R. Michael LaBelle, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
11/09/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) R. Michael LaBelle, Esquire
12/01/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
01/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (86pgs/Shelton) 10/1/10 proc.
01/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (199pgs/Shelton) 10/4-5/10 proc.
01/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (16pgs/Tape) 10/19/10 proc. w/CD
01/05/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/11/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/20/2011RECORD INDEX
01/20/2011RECORD COPIES
02/22/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until April 8, 2011 (no oppo)
03/03/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 8, 2011. (By: JAC)
04/06/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until June 8, 2011 (no oppo)
04/25/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 8, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (By: JAC)
06/09/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until July 25, 2011 (no oppo)
06/29/2011ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before July 25, 2011. No further requests for extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of good cause. (By: ETW)
07/29/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File - to file brief and appendix (Appellant)
08/12/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged brief and limited appendix
08/12/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
08/12/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
09/12/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)Granted
09/14/2011FiledTMC/MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
05/14/2013FiledOrder Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
05/14/2013FiledAffirmed
05/23/2013FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
06/05/2013FiledMandate