judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2322
A-2322
07/09/1949
Application for Writ of Error
CONSTRUCTION AND GENERAL LABOR UNION, LOCAL NO. 688, ET AL.
H. I. STEPHENSON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/19/1950Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/18/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/18/1949Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/17/1949Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedPetitioner
11/17/1949Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/12/1949Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/03/1949Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/03/1949Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/03/1949Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/02/1949Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/02/1949Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/02/1949Brief on the MeritsRespondent
10/31/1949Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/31/1949Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
10/10/1949Exhibits in case/cause filed
07/09/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/19/1950Motion for Rehearing
01/18/1950Motion for Rehearing
01/04/1950Concurring Opinion issued.
01/04/1950Opinion issued
11/18/1949Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/17/1949Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
11/17/1949Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/12/1949Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/03/1949Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/03/1949Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/03/1949Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/02/1949Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/02/1949Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/02/1949Brief on the Merits
10/31/1949Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/31/1949Brief on the Merits
10/10/1949Exhibits in case/cause filed
10/05/1949Document received (See Remarks)
07/09/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/09/1949Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Powell, Wirtz and RauhutAmicus Curiae
Strickland, Wilkins, Hall and MillsAmicus Curiae
Phinney, Romick and HallmanAmicus Curiae
Kelley, Mosheim and RyanAmicus Curiae
Tom M. Davis, V. M. McLeod, Hugh M. Patterson and Robert C. LanierAmicus Curiae
Construction and General Labor Union, Local No. 688, et al.Petitioner
Burford, Ryburn, Hincks and FordAmicus Curiae
John Q. Weatherly, Carl Illig and Lamar Stone, Jr.Amicus Curiae
Clark, Coon, Holt and FisherAmicus Curiae
Vinson, Elkins, Weems and FrancisAmicus Curiae
H. I. StephensonRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information